Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/23/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 07/10/2013
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 09/18/2014