There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of the centennial of Boys Town, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/22/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
05/22/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 10/10/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/10/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/16/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/13/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/18/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 11/19/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 12/11/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/12/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/12/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/19/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 12/19/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 01/07/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/24/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/24/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/24/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 02/25/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 02/25/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/13/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/13/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 03/13/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/27/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/31/2014
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 04/01/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/03/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 04/03/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/05/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/07/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/03/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 06/05/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/11/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/07/2014
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/21/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/30/2014
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/10/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/15/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/17/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/17/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/17/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/18/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/18/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/18/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 09/18/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/18/2014
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 11/12/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/12/2014
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/12/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/12/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/12/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 11/12/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 11/18/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 11/18/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 11/18/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 11/19/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/19/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/19/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 11/19/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 11/19/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/19/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 11/19/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/19/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/20/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/20/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/20/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/20/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 12/02/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 12/03/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs05/22/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1011. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/22/2013)

Boys Town Centennial Commemorative Coin Act - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 50,000 $5 gold coins, 350,000 $1 silver coins, and 300,000 half-dollar clad coins to commemorate the centennial of the founding of Father Flanagan's Boys Town.

Requires the design of the coins to be emblematic of the 100 years of Boys Town, one of the largest nonprofit child care agencies in the United States.

Permits issuance of such coins only between January 1, 2017, and December 31, 2018.