Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 05/22/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/04/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/23/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/31/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/09/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/29/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 10/31/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/06/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 12/19/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 01/28/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/01/2014
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 05/06/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/12/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/17/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 07/31/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/31/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 11/17/2014