Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/07/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/10/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/11/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/18/2013