Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/04/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/12/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 11/13/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/03/2014