Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/19/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/26/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/16/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/16/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/25/2013