Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/20/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/20/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/21/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/22/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/05/2014
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/05/2014
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/05/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/05/2014
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 06/05/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/05/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 06/05/2014
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/09/2014
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/09/2014
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/09/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/09/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/11/2014
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 06/11/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/11/2014
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 06/11/2014
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 06/11/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/11/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 06/12/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/12/2014
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/17/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/17/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/08/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/21/2014
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/21/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/21/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/21/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/21/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/21/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 07/21/2014
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/21/2014
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/21/2014
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/21/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/21/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/22/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/23/2014
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/28/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 07/28/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 07/30/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/15/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/15/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 09/15/2014
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 11/12/2014
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 11/13/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 11/13/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/13/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 11/13/2014
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/13/2014
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 11/13/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/13/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/13/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/17/2014
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/17/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 11/17/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/18/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/18/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/19/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/19/2014
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 11/19/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 11/19/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/19/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/20/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/20/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 11/20/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/03/2014