Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/07/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/17/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/26/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/18/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/06/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 12/12/2013