Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/30/2013
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/09/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 10/29/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 11/06/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/19/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 02/24/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 03/24/2014