Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/08/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/08/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/18/2014