Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 06/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/24/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/26/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 04/09/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/30/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/20/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 05/20/2014
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/21/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 06/03/2014