Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/17/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/09/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/10/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/16/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/23/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2013