Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/23/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 07/23/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/24/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/29/2013