Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/04/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 06/27/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/17/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 09/19/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/25/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/06/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/30/2014