Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 01/31/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/31/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/04/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/04/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 03/19/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/13/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 06/17/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/20/2013
Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] 07/16/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 07/08/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/08/2014
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/14/2014
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 07/15/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/15/2014