Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/10/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/13/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/23/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/19/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 01/06/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 03/11/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/24/2014