There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 130 Caldwell Drive in Hazlehurst, Mississippi, as the "First Lieutenant Alvin Chester Cockrell, Jr. Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
11/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-191. (TXT | PDF)
11/26/2014Signed by President.
11/19/2014Presented to President.
11/17/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8008)
08/01/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6258-6259; text as passed Senate: CR S6259)
07/31/2013Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
06/04/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
11/26/2014Became Public Law No: 113-191. (TXT | PDF)
11/26/2014Signed by President.
11/19/2014SenatePresented to President.
11/17/2014-2:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/17/2014-2:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8008)
11/17/2014-2:53pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1093.
11/17/2014-2:53pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8008-8009)
11/17/2014-2:52pmHouseMr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/02/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
08/02/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2013-10:07amHouseReceived in the House.
08/01/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6258-6259; text as passed Senate: CR S6259)
07/31/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 160.
07/31/2013SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
07/31/2013SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/04/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/27/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/04/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
07/31/2013 Reported by
House Oversight and Government Reform08/02/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1093.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1093. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-191 (11/26/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 130 Caldwell Drive in Hazlehurst, Mississippi, as the "First Lieutenant Alvin Chester Cockrell, Jr. Post Office Building."