There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014

Short Titles as Introduced

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to measure the progress of recovery and development efforts in Haiti following the earthquake of January 12, 2010, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-162. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
07/29/2014Presented to President.
07/25/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H6837-6838)
07/10/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4434-4435; text as passed Senate: CR S4434-4435)
06/26/2014Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-201.
06/06/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/08/2014Became Public Law No: 113-162. (TXT | PDF)
08/08/2014Signed by President.
07/29/2014SenatePresented to President.
07/25/2014-1:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/25/2014-1:04pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H6837-6838)
07/25/2014-1:04pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H6838-6839)
07/25/2014-1:04pmHouseMr. Smith (NJ) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
07/14/2014-9:12pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/14/2014-2:06pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/14/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/10/2014SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4434-4435; text as passed Senate: CR S4434-4435)
06/26/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 447.
06/26/2014SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 113-201.
06/24/2014SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/06/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/06/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/06/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/17/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations06/06/2013 Referred to
06/24/2014 Markup by
06/26/2014 Reported by S. Rept. 113-201

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1104. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-162 (08/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the Senate on June 26, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Assessing Progress in Haiti Act of 2014 - Expresses the sense of Congress that transparency, accountability, democracy, and good governance are integral factors in any congressional decision regarding U.S. assistance, including assistance to Haiti.

Directs the Secretary of State to report to Congress annually through December 31, 2017, on the status of post-earthquake recovery and development efforts in Haiti.

Directs the Secretary, through the Assistant Secretary of State for Western Hemisphere Affairs, to coordinate and transmit to Congress a three-year Haiti strategy that: (1) identifies constraints to economic growth and to consolidation of democratic government institutions; (2) includes an action plan that outlines policy tools, technical assistance, and resources for addressing the highest-priority constraints; and (3) identifies specific steps and benchmarks to provide direct bilateral assistance to the government of Haiti.