Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 06/12/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/09/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/12/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/18/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/31/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/13/2014