Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/07/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 06/13/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/13/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/13/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/24/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/24/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/31/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/01/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 08/01/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 11/04/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/04/2013