There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand the Alpine Lakes Wilderness in the State of Washington, to designate the Middle Fork Snoqualmie River and Pratt River as wild and scenic rivers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/19/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4718-4719)
04/22/2013Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-17.
01/23/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/21/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/20/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
06/20/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/20/2013-2:00pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/19/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4717-4722; text as passed Senate: CR S4718-4719)
04/22/2013SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 48.
04/22/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Wyden without amendment. With written report No. 113-17.
03/14/2013SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/23/2013SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/23/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/23/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/22/2013 Reported by S. Rept. 113-17
House Natural Resources06/20/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation06/21/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.112. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (06/19/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate reported version is repeated here.)

Alpine Lakes Wilderness Additions and Pratt and Middle Fork Snoqualmie Rivers Protection Act - Designates certain land in the Mount Baker-Snoqualmie National Forest in the state of Washington, which shall be considered to become a part of the Alpine Lakes Wilderness, as wilderness and as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.

Makes any land or interests within the proposed boundary acquired by the United States part of the Wilderness.

Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to designate the Middle Fork Snoqualmie and Pratt Rivers in Washington as scenic and/or wild rivers.