Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/04/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/28/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/22/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/07/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/07/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/13/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/31/2014