Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/20/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/10/2014
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 04/01/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/17/2014