Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/31/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/21/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 02/03/2014
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/24/2014
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/12/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/08/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/08/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/11/2014