Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/28/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/04/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/22/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/07/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/24/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/23/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 02/03/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/03/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/05/2014
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 06/17/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 07/22/2014