Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/11/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/20/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/12/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 04/30/2014
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 06/05/2014