Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/12/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/12/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 06/18/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 06/25/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/10/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND] 07/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/24/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/15/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/28/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/06/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 11/07/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 11/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/13/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 12/20/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 02/10/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/03/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 05/06/2014