Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/12/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/24/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 11/21/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/09/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 12/09/2013