Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/29/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/14/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 01/07/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/12/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 04/01/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/09/2014