Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/25/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/27/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/29/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/29/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/29/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/01/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/01/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/10/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/11/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/25/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/25/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/29/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/31/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/06/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/13/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/20/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/10/2013