Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/19/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/25/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/25/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 06/27/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/09/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/09/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 07/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 07/29/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/29/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/29/2013
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 08/01/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 08/01/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 08/01/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 08/01/2013
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/01/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2013
Sen. Chiesa, Jeff [R-NJ] 08/01/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 08/01/2013
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 08/01/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 08/01/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 08/01/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 08/01/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/10/2013
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/10/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 09/11/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/11/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/12/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/12/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 09/17/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 09/24/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/25/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/25/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 09/25/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/26/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/30/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/30/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/30/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/01/2013
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/09/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 10/28/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/28/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/28/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/28/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/28/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] 10/29/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/31/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 10/31/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/04/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 11/06/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/06/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 11/12/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 11/14/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/20/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 12/10/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 02/11/2014
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 07/31/2014