Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 06/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2013
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 06/18/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/25/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 06/27/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/27/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/09/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/18/2013