Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/17/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/09/2013
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/11/2013
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/16/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/12/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/19/2013