There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal to the 65th Infantry Regiment, known as the Borinqueneers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/18/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
06/18/2013Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/27/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/27/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/11/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/30/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 08/01/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/11/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/29/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/05/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/07/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/08/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/09/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/14/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/16/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/28/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/28/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/03/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/03/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/06/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/24/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/24/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/24/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/25/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/04/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/04/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/13/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/13/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/13/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/13/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/25/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/25/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/25/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/01/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/29/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/29/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/01/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/05/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/05/2014
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/06/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/06/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/07/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/13/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/15/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/20/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/20/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/20/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/21/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/22/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/18/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)

  • Caribbean area
  • Congressional tributes
  • Military personnel and dependents
  • Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
  • Puerto Rico
  • Veterans' organizations and recognition

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1174. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/18/2013)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate to make appropriate arrangements for the award, on behalf of Congress, of a single gold medal in honor of the 65th Infantry Regiment, known as the Borinqueneers, in recognition of its pioneering military service, devotion to duty, and many acts of valor in the face of adversity.

Requires the medal to be given to the Smithsonian Institution (Smithsonian) for display. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Smithsonian shall make the medal available for display elsewhere, particularly at appropriate locations associated with the 65th Infantry Regiment, including locations in Puerto Rico.