Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/27/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 06/27/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/11/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/30/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 07/30/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 08/01/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 09/11/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 09/11/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/12/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/29/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 10/29/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 11/05/2013
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 11/07/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 01/08/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 01/09/2014
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 01/14/2014
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 01/16/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/28/2014
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 01/28/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/03/2014
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/03/2014
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/06/2014
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/24/2014
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/24/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 02/24/2014
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/25/2014
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 02/27/2014
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/04/2014
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/04/2014
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 03/13/2014
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 03/13/2014
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 03/13/2014
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/13/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/13/2014
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/25/2014
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] 03/25/2014
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/25/2014
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/26/2014
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 04/01/2014
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN] 04/01/2014
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/10/2014
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/29/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/29/2014
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/01/2014
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 05/05/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/05/2014
Sen. King, Angus S. Jr. [I-ME] 05/06/2014
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/06/2014
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/06/2014
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/07/2014
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/12/2014
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/13/2014
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/15/2014
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 05/20/2014
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/20/2014
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 05/20/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/21/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/22/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/22/2014
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/22/2014