Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/18/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 06/20/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/08/2013
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/09/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT] 07/29/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/31/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/01/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 09/10/2013
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 11/07/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 12/17/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/16/2014
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 01/27/2014
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV] 02/03/2014
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 02/24/2014
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/04/2014
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 03/05/2014
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/14/2014