Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN]* 06/19/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/16/2013
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 07/23/2013
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 07/24/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/24/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/24/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 07/24/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 08/01/2013
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 09/11/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/25/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 10/28/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/04/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/21/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/13/2014
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/06/2014
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/12/2014
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 06/04/2014
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/12/2014
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/30/2014