Limit your search

1-14 of 14
  1. S.Amdt.2472   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.2445   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  3. S.Amdt.2425   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2295   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  5. S.Amdt.2176   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 12
  6. S.Amdt.2172   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9
  7. S.Amdt.2171   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  8. S.Amdt.2170   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  9. S.Amdt.2160   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  10. S.Amdt.2155   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 10
  11. S.Amdt.2148   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  12. S.Amdt.2087   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  13. S.Amdt.2080   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  14. S.Amdt.2031   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] (Submitted 11/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3