Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  1. S.Amdt.2536   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  2. S.Amdt.2359   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  3. S.Amdt.2179   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  4. S.Amdt.2178   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.2145   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  6. S.Amdt.2137   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  7. S.Amdt.2118   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 14
  8. S.Amdt.2088   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  9. S.Amdt.2046   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  10. S.Amdt.2045   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  11. S.Amdt.2044   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  12. S.Amdt.2043   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  13. S.Amdt.2042   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6