Limit your search

1-17 of 17
  1. S.Amdt.2511   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
  2. S.Amdt.2429   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
  3. S.Amdt.2295   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  4. S.Amdt.2287   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  5. S.Amdt.2255   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Purpose To propose alternative requirements and limitations applicable to individuals detained at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba.
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/19/2013) (Proposed 11/19/2013)
    Latest Action: 11/19/13 Amendment SA 2255, under the order of 11/19/13, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 55. Record Vote Number: 237.
  6. S.Amdt.2189   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  7. S.Amdt.2185   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  8. S.Amdt.2176   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  9. S.Amdt.2172   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  10. S.Amdt.2170   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  11. S.Amdt.2155   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
  12. S.Amdt.2145   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
  13. S.Amdt.2121   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
  14. S.Amdt.2118   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
  15. S.Amdt.2080   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
  16. S.Amdt.2077   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
  17. S.Amdt.2067   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 11/14/2013)