Limit your search

1-17 of 17
  1. S.Amdt.2489   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 8
  2. S.Amdt.2453   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  3. S.Amdt.2391   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 2
  4. S.Amdt.2348   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  5. S.Amdt.2255   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: To propose alternative requirements and limitations applicable to individuals detained at United States Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba.
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/19/2013) (Proposed 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
    Latest Action: 11/19/13 Amendment SA 2255, under the order of 11/19/13, not having achieved 60 votes in the affirmative, was not agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 43 - 55. Record Vote Number: 237.
  6. S.Amdt.2185   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 7
  7. S.Amdt.2183   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 3
  8. S.Amdt.2176   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 12
  9. S.Amdt.2170   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  10. S.Amdt.2136   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  11. S.Amdt.2066   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  12. S.Amdt.2046   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  13. S.Amdt.2045   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  14. S.Amdt.2044   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  15. S.Amdt.2043   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 5
  16. S.Amdt.2042   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 6
  17. S.Amdt.2040   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9