Limit your search

1-8 of 8
  1. S.Amdt.2489   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 8
  2. S.Amdt.2440   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 15
  3. S.Amdt.2284   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  4. S.Amdt.2219   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 19
  5. S.Amdt.2172   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9
  6. S.Amdt.2099   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 29
  7. S.Amdt.2067   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 13
  8. S.Amdt.2040   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 9