Limit your search

1-13 of 13
  1. S.Amdt.2493   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  2. S.Amdt.2465   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  3. S.Amdt.2464   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/21/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  4. S.Amdt.2424   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 4
  5. S.Amdt.2372   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/20/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  6. S.Amdt.2197   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/19/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  7. S.Amdt.2128   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  8. S.Amdt.2095   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  9. S.Amdt.2084   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/18/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1
  10. S.Amdt.2061   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  11. S.Amdt.2039   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/14/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  12. S.Amdt.2026   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 0
  13. S.Amdt.2025   — 113th Congress (2013-2014)

    Description: None
    Sponsor: Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] (Submitted 11/13/2013)
    Cosponsors: 1