Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE] 06/24/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/26/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/27/2013
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/27/2013
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 07/10/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/16/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/23/2013
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/29/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/30/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH] 07/31/2013
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/09/2013
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/12/2013
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/24/2013
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 09/25/2013
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 01/07/2014
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/07/2014
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/15/2014
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/2014
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/04/2014