Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/20/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/30/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/10/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/11/2013
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/05/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/05/2013
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 11/13/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 01/16/2014
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 02/12/2014
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/12/2014
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/24/2014
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 02/24/2014
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/12/2014
Sen. Walsh, John E. [D-MT] 06/25/2014