Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Johanns, Mike [R-NE]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Heitkamp, Heidi [D-ND]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Hagan, Kay [D-NC]* 06/25/2013
Sen. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL] 07/10/2013
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 07/31/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/09/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK] 12/11/2013