Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/27/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/09/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/04/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 11/05/2013