Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/23/2013
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 01/30/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 02/04/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/11/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 04/25/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/07/2013
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/09/2013