Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Heller, Dean [R-NV]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Ayotte, Kelly [R-NH]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/26/2013
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/27/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/27/2013
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/23/2013
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/31/2013
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 08/01/2013
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/23/2013
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/12/2013
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 12/11/2013
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/30/2014
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/12/2014
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/20/2014