There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Keep Student Loans Affordable Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend the current reduced interest rate for undergraduate Federal Direct Stafford Loans for 1 year, to modify required distribution rules for pension plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/27/2013Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date
07/17/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5717-5718)
Action By: Senate
07/16/2013Motion to proceed to measure considered in Senate. (consideration: CR S5691)
Action By: Senate
07/15/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5675)
Action By: Senate
07/11/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5625-5628)
Action By: Senate
07/10/2013Motion by Senator Reid to reconsider the vote by which cloture was not invoked on the motion to proceed to the measure (Record Vote No. 171) made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5595)
Action By: Senate
07/10/2013Cloture on the motion to proceed to measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 49. Record Vote Number: 171. (consideration: CR S5595; text: CR S5595)
Action By: Senate
07/10/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5584-5602, S5603-5615)
Action By: Senate
07/09/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5531-5537, S5543-5564)
Action By: Senate
07/08/2013Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to measure presented in Senate. (consideration: CR S5522-5524; text: CR S5522)
Action By: Senate
07/08/2013Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (consideration: CR S5513-5514)
Action By: Senate
06/27/2013Introduced in the Senate. Read twice. Ordered Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 124.
Action By: Senate
06/27/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5317, S5476)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagan, Kay R. [D-NC]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Franken, Al [D-MN]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Begich, Mark [D-AK]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 06/27/2013
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/08/2013
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/08/2013
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/09/2013
Sen. Cowan, William M. [D-MA] 07/09/2013
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/09/2013
Sen. Udall, Mark [D-CO] 07/11/2013

Committees (0)

As of 06/17/2018 text has not been received for S.1238 - Keep Student Loans Affordable Act of 2013

Bills are generally sent to the Library of Congress from GPO, the Government Publishing Office, a day or two after they are introduced on the floor of the House or Senate. Delays can occur when there are a large number of bills to prepare or when a very large bill has to be printed.


A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1238. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/27/2013)

Keep Student Loans Affordable Act of 2013 - Amends title IV (Student Assistance) of the Higher Education Act of 1965 to extend the 3.4% interest rate on Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students between July 1, 2011, and July 1, 2013, to Direct Stafford loans first disbursed to undergraduate students between July 1, 2011, and July 1, 2014.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify rules for required distributions from tax-exempt pension plans to an employee who dies before such employee's entire interest is distributed to require such interest to be distributed within five years after the death of such employee, subject to exceptions for an eligible designated beneficiary and surviving spouse of such employee. Defines "eligible designated beneficiary" to include a disabled or chronically-ill individual. Exempts from such modification a binding annuity contract in effect on the enactment date of this Act.